EP2519356 - MODIFIED HIGH INTENSITY MAGNETIC SEPARATION (HIMS) PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For:DE
PL
Siemens AG 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For:DE
PL
Siemens AG 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMKE, Imme Werderstr. 6 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
RIEGER, Reinhold Tränkgasse 5 67591 Offstein / DE | 03 /
MICHAILOVSKI, Alexej Otto-Dill-Strasse 16 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
BITTNER, Christian Nibelungenstrasse 26 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2014/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/45] | Steinbusch, Daniel Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10832743.8 | 29.11.2010 | [2019/25] | WO2010IB55465 | Priority number, date | US20090264846P | 30.11.2009 Original published format: US 264846 P | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011064757 | Date: | 03.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519356 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2519356 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/015, B03C1/005, B03C1/00, B03C1/032, B03C1/01 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
B03C1/002 (EP,US);
B03C1/015 (EP,US);
B03C1/032 (EP,US);
B03C2201/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | B03C1/015, B03C1/005, B03C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES HOCHINTENSIVES MAGNETISCHES ABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/45] | English: | MODIFIED HIGH INTENSITY MAGNETIC SEPARATION (HIMS) PROCESS | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MODIFIÉ DE SÉPARATION MAGNÉTIQUE À HAUTE INTENSITÉ (HIMS) | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 20.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2010 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | GB | 29.11.2019 | IE | 29.11.2019 | LU | 29.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.11.2010 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GB | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.11.2010 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GB | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GB | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GB | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GB | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 19.06.2019 | |
NO | 19.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1354148 (BASF AG) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]US3838773 (KOLM H) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 9 - line 34 * * column 4, line 43 - line 58 *; | [A]US4157953 (MAWARDI OSMAN K [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 *; | [A]US6224777 (IANNICELLI JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [YD]WO2009030669 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [YD] 1-12 * page 9, line 31 - line 35 * * page 5, line 21 - line 26 * * page 8, line 6 - line 7 * * page 8, line 41 - page 9, line 2 * * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 4 * * page 13, line 20 - line 22 * * page 13, line 31 - line 39 * * page 15, line 2 - line 5 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 6 - line 7 * * page 14, line 27 - line 31 * | International search | [A]US4225426 (PRICE WILLIAM M, et al); | [A]US4643822 (PARSONAGE PHILIP G [GB]); | [X]WO2009030669 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [X]WO2009065802 (BASF SE [DE], et al) |