EP2504166 - SURFACE COATING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street, M/S 509 Sturtevant, WI 53177-0902 / US | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CYPCAR, Christopher, C. 5334 Willowview Road Racine WI 53402 / US | 02 /
JANS, Josef Stadlerstrasse 33 CH-8472 Seuzach / CH | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10833943.3 | 24.11.2010 | WO2010US58040 | Priority number, date | US20090264471P | 25.11.2009 Original published format: US 264471 P | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011066413 | Date: | 03.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2504166 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B7/06, C09D5/20, B32B33/00, // B32B27/18, B32B27/40 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
B32B33/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B05D5/00 (KR);
B32B27/18 (KR);
B32B37/06 (KR);
C09D5/20 (EP,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,US);
B32B43/006 (EP,US);
E04F15/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | B32B27/08, B32B27/40, B32B27/18, B32B37/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/40] | English: | SURFACE COATING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2012/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE | [2012/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 22.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2003152766 (VARGO TERRENCE G [US], et al); | [A]US2005015140 (DEBEER NICHOLAS [US]); | [X]WO2008144535 (JOHNSON DIVERSEY INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008144535 |