EP2507263 - ANTI-IGF-IR ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Hong Kong Pokfulam Road Hong Kong / CN | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Meiyun Flat 5, 5th Floor Block A Parkway Court 4 Park Road Hong Kong / HK | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2016/36] |
Former [2012/41] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10834154.6 | 06.12.2010 | [2016/36] | WO2010CN01963 | Priority number, date | US20090266681P | 04.12.2009 Original published format: US 266681 P | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011066721 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2507263 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2507263 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C12N5/18, C12N15/13, A61K39/00, A61K39/395 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-IGF-IR-ANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2012/41] | English: | ANTI-IGF-IR ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2012/41] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-IGF-IR ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 31.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 12.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2010 | AL | 07.09.2016 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 06.12.2016 | LU | 06.12.2016 | MT | 06.12.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
MT | 06.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - MEI-YUN ZHANG ET AL, "Characterization of a chimeric monoclonal antibody against the insulin-like growth factor-I receptor", MABS, (20090901), vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.4161/mabs.1.5.9580, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 475 - 480, XP055058186 [X] 1,3-6,8-11 * whole document, especially the Abstract; Figures 1 and 4 * [I] 2,7,12-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.1.5.9580 | International search | [X]WO2007012614 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR], et al); | [X]CN101014625 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR]); | [A] - FENG L. ET AL, "Expression and clinic significance of IGF-IR in Breast Cancer tissue", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL FORUM, (200803), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 8 - 10, XP008160352 | [A] - SUN, LIYAN ET AL, "Advancement in research on insulin-like growth factor in cancer metastasis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (200806), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 329 - 336, XP008160320 | by applicant | - ZHANG ET AL., MABS, (2009), vol. 1, pages 475 - 480 |