EP2489193 - EMBEDDED GRAPHICS CODING: REORDERED BITSTREAM FOR PARALLEL DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wei 1365 Meadow Ridge Cir. San Jose California 95131 / US | 02 /
GHARAVI-ALKHANSARI, Mohammad 3602 Flora Vista Ave. 306 Santa Clara California 95015 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10834958.0 | 22.11.2010 | WO2010US57648 | Priority number, date | US20090266400P | 03.12.2009 Original published format: US 266400 P | US20100950843 | 19.11.2010 Original published format: US 950843 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011068710 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2489193 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/64, H04N19/34, H04N19/70, H04N19/436, H04N19/90 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H04N19/34 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/436 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/647 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/90 (EP,BR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | KODIERUNG EINGEBETTETER GRAPHIKEN: NEUGEORDNETER BITSTREAM FÜR PARALLELE DEKODIERUNG | [2012/34] | English: | EMBEDDED GRAPHICS CODING: REORDERED BITSTREAM FOR PARALLEL DECODING | [2012/34] | French: | CODAGE GRAPHIQUE INCORPORÉ : TRAIN DE BITS RÉORDONNÉ POUR DÉCODAGE PARALLÈLE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 22.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6614939 (YAMAUCHI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,11,15 * figures 1,15 * * column 8, line 19 - line 27 * [Y] 5 [I] 6; | [Y]GB2319689 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 5 * claim 5 *; | [XYI]US6658159 (TAUBMAN DAVID S [AU]) [X] 7,12 * column 7, line 36 - line 39 * * column 9, line 21 - line 25 * [Y] 10,14 [I] 8,13; | [IY]US7418146 (WATANABE TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 7-9,12,13 * column 4, line 5 - line 31 * [Y] 10,14; | [A]US7062101 (SCHWARTZ EDWARD L [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - RABBANI M ET AL, "An overview of the JPEG 2000 still image compression standard", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0923-5965(01)00024-8, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 3 - 48, XP004326797 [Y] 10 * page 22, column right, line 8 - line 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(01)00024-8 | International search | [A]US2009158130 (CHEUN KYUNG WHOON [KR], et al); | [A]US5471206 (ALLEN JAMES D [US], et al); | [A]WO2009134575 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [A]JP2003274406 (KDDI RES & DEV LAB INC) | by applicant | US6614939 | GB2319689 | US6658159 | US7418146 | - "An overview of the JPEG 2000 still image compression standard", RABBANI M ET AL., SIGNAL PROCESSING, IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (20020101), vol. 17, pages 3 - 48 |