EP2485557 - METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR COORDINATED SCHEDULING (CoMP) BASED ON CELL PRIORITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/32] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COORDINATED SCHEDULING BASED ON CELL PRIORITY | ||
[2019/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Kaibo c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Nan c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
PENG, Aihua c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Jing c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Dong c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10835503.3 | 10.12.2010 | WO2010CN79657 | Priority number, date | CN200910254334 | 11.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910254334 | [2012/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011069468 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485557 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/10, H04W72/12, H04L5/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W4/00 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W72/54 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | H04B7/024, H04L5/00, H04W72/12 | ||
Former IPC [2012/32] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR KOORDINIERTES SCHEDULING (CoMP) AUF BASIS VON ZELLPRIORITÄTEN | [2019/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR COORDINATED SCHEDULING (CoMP) BASED ON CELL PRIORITY | [2019/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈMEs DE PLANIFICATION COORDONNÉE (CoMP) BASÉE SUR UNE PRIORITÉ DE CELLULE | [2019/20] |
Former [2012/32] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR KOORDINIERTE TERMINPLANUNG AUF BASIS VON ZELLPRIORITÄTEN | ||
Former [2012/32] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COORDINATED SCHEDULING BASED ON CELL PRIORITY | ||
Former [2012/32] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION COORDONNÉE BASÉE SUR UNE PRIORITÉ DE CELLULE | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2012 | Translation filed | 27.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CATT, "Considerations on Spatial Domain Coordination in LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094144, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091012), no. Miyazaki; 20091012, XP050388614 [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [03.1]; figures 1,2 * | [A] - 3gpp Ran Wg1, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Further Advancements for E-UTRA Physical Layer Aspects (Release 9) 3GPP TR 36.814 V1.5.0(2009-11)", (20091113), pages 1 - 51, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_59/Docs/R1-095091.zip, (20170509), XP055370428 [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0008] - [8.1.1] * | [A] - BENGTSSON M ET AL, "D1.4 Initial report on advanced multiple antenna systems", WIRELESS WORLD INITIATIVE NEW RADIO - WINNER+,, vol. Final/1.0, (20090116), pages 1 - 110, URL: http://projects.celtic-initiative.org/winner+/WINNER+%20Deliverables/D1.4_v1.0.pdf, (20090116), XP008113535 [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [2.1.3.1]; figures 2.1,2.5 * * paragraphs [0003] - [3.2.1.2]; figure 3.2 * | International search | [A]CN101442808 (UNIV XIDIAN [CN]); | [A]CN101478342 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]); | [A]CN101516112 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]); | [A]EP2101460 (NEC LAB AMERICA INC [US]) |