EP2509510 - AN OVULATION SENSING AND ANALYZING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fridenson, Arie 35 Ruth St. 34404 Haifa / IL | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-DAVID, Yoav 23/2 Stimatzky St. 69362 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Alfonso Tösswiesenstrasse 3a 8413 Neftenbach / CH | 03 /
MENDEL, Boaz 8/7 Giveon St. 94521 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
BEERI, Boaz 4B Shimshon St. Bikah 93501 Jerusalem / IL | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 10835609.8 | 09.12.2010 | WO2010IL01038 | Priority number, date | US20090267971P | 09.12.2009 Original published format: US 267971 P | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011070577 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2509510 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A61B10/0012 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | EISPRUNGS-ERFASSUNGS- UND ANALYSESYSTEM | [2012/42] | English: | AN OVULATION SENSING AND ANALYZING SYSTEM | [2012/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION ET D'ANALYSE D'OVULATION | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2014 | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4151831 (LESTER ROBERT W [US]) [X] 4 * abstract * [Y] 5-15; | [XI]WO2008029130 (FERTILITY FOCUS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3; | [Y]US4465077 (SCHNEIDER HOWARD [CA]) [Y] 5-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4151831 (LESTER ROBERT W [US]); | [Y]WO2008110949 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]US4387724 (ZARTMAN DAVID L); | [A]US2009036761 (ABREU MARCIO MARC [US]) |