EP2510039 - COPOLYETHER ESTER ELASTOMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Qun 154 New Granville Road Wilmington, DE 19808-1106 / US | 02 /
MCINNIS, Edwin, L. 1506 Berwick Bend Zachary, LA 70791-5445 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10836337.5 | 06.05.2010 | WO2010US33863 | Priority number, date | WO2009US06768 | 11.12.2009 Original published format: PCT/US2009/006768 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011071558 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510039 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08G63/672 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/66 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C08G2261/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | COPOLYETHER-ESTER-ELASTOMER | [2012/42] | English: | COPOLYETHER ESTER ELASTOMER | [2012/42] | French: | ÉLASTOMÈRE CO-POLYÉTHER ESTER | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 17.05.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009032560 (INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples 1-12 *; | [Y]WO2006119059 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples 1-2 *; | [A]US5162455 (GREENE ROBIN N [US]) [A] 1-16 * examples I-VII * | International search | [X]USH1669H (MATAYABAS JR JAMES C [US], et al); | [X]US5162455 (GREENE ROBIN N [US]); | [A]EP0353768 (DU PONT [US]) |