EP2509761 - HOT-RUNNER SYSTEM INCLUDING MELT-FLOW CONTROL STRUCTURE MACHINED INTEGRAL TO MANIFOLD BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACLEOD, Darrin, Albert 35 Williamson Road Jeffersonville, VT 05464 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 10836365.6 | 08.10.2010 | WO2010US51992 | Priority number, date | US20090267856P | 09.12.2009 Original published format: US 267856 P | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011071592 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509761 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29C45/27, B29C45/30 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
B29C45/30 (EP,US);
B29C45/2725 (EP,CN,US);
B29C33/3842 (CN);
B29C45/2727 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | B29C45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | HEISSFLUSSSYSTEM MIT EINER IN EINEN VERTEILERKÖRPER INTEGRIERTEN SCHMELZFLUSSSTEUERUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2012/42] | English: | HOT-RUNNER SYSTEM INCLUDING MELT-FLOW CONTROL STRUCTURE MACHINED INTEGRAL TO MANIFOLD BODY | [2012/42] | French: | SYSTÈME À CANAUX CHAUFFÉS COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE COMMANDE D'INDICE DE FLUIDITÉ USINÉE D'UN SEUL TENANT AVEC LE CORPS DE COLLECTEUR | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 05.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004130062 (SICILIA ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0075] - [0078]; figures 1-3,9,11 * | International search | [X]US6796786 (WHITE JOHN RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US7614872 (OLARU GHEORGHE [US], et al) |