EP2467136 - 4-METHYLPYRAZOLE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raptor Therapeutics Inc. 7 Hamilton Landing, Suite 100 Novato, CA 94949 / US | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Raptor Therapeutics Inc. 5 Hamilton Landing, Suite 160 Novato, CA 94949 / US | ||
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Raptor Therapeutics Inc. 9 Commercial Boulevard, Suite 200 Novato, CA 94949 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALEY, Thomas, E. 536 E. Hillsdale San Mateo CA 94403 / US | 02 /
POWELL, Kathy 100 Oxyard Way Cary NC 27519 / US | 03 /
JARZEBINSKI, Olga 9357 Carriage Run Circle Loveland OH 45140 / US | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, Lisa, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Kiernan, Lisa, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/52] | Savic, Bojan, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Ritter, Thomas Kurt, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10836472.0 | 06.12.2010 | WO2010US59065 | Priority number, date | US20090267389P | 07.12.2009 Original published format: US 267389 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011071805 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467136 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467136 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61P25/32, A61K9/48 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/4825 (US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (US);
A61P25/32 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | A61K31/415, A61P25/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 4-METHYLPYRAZOL-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2012/26] | English: | 4-METHYLPYRAZOLE FORMULATIONS | [2012/26] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE 4-MÉTHYLPYRAZOLE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 04.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14150138.7 / EP2774612 | EP17187679.0 / EP3300732 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2010 | AL | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | RS | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.12.2010 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003138390 (SAINT-LEGER DIDIER [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * claims 6,13,17 * | [A] - Dial Sm ET AL, "Efficacy of 4-methylpyrazole for treatment of ethylene glycol intoxication in dogs.", (19940101), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/7887524, (20121212), XP055047588 [A] 1-16 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2008021083 (DALEY THOMAS E [US]); | [Y]US2005069587 (MODI NISHIT BACHULAL [US], et al); | [Y]US2005147565 (SEQUEIRA JOEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US6120806 (WHITMIRE DAVID R [US]); | [A] - FEIERMAN ET AL., "°Increased Sensitivity of the Microsomal Oxidation of Ethanol to Inhibition by Pyrazole and 4-Methylpyrazole After Chronic Ethanol Treatment.°", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (198710), vol. 36, no. 19, pages 3277 - 3283, XP008153898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(87)90645-9 | [A] - LINDROS ET AL., "A Simple Procedure Using 4-Methylpyrazole for Developing Tolerance and Other Chronic Alcohol Effects.°", ALCOHOL, (198404), vol. 1, no. ISS. 2, pages 145 - 150, XP024399797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0741-8329(84)90071-5 | by applicant | - GOEDDE ET AL., HUM. GENET., (1992), vol. 88, pages 344 - 346 | - XIAO ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 96, pages 2180 - 2186 | - WARD ET AL., ALCOHOL AND ALCOHOLISM, (1994), vol. 29, pages 433 - 438 |