EP2448355 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR COOPERATIVE SCHEDULING AMONG MULTIPLE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Kaibo c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Aihua c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Dong c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Chenchen c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10837027.1 | 10.12.2010 | WO2010CN79663 | Priority number, date | CN200910261640 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910261640 | [2012/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011072590 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448355 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04J11/00, H04W84/04 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H04J11/0053 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR KOOPERATIVE PLANUNG ZWISCHEN MEHREREN ZELLEN | [2012/18] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR COOPERATIVE SCHEDULING AMONG MULTIPLE CELLS | [2012/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION COOPÉRATIVE PARMI DE MULTIPLES CELLULES | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | Translation filed | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007280175 (CHENG FANG-CHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0024] - [0110] ** figure 1 *; | [XI] - HUAWEI, "Evaluation Methodology for DL CoMP Performance against 3GPP Requirements", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094699 EVALUATION METHODOLOGY FOR DL COMP PERFORMANCE AGAINST 3GPP REQUIREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091103), vol. RAN WG1, no. Jeju, Korea; 20091109 - 20091113, XP050597838 [X] 1,4,6,7,10 * Sections 1-2 * [I] 2,3,5,8,9,11 | [I] - "CoMP: Common Feedback Framework and Operation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094403 FEEDBACK AND COMP OVERVIEW - FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091017), vol. RAN WG1, no. Miyazaki; 20091012 - 20091016, XP050597807 [I] 1-11 * pages 9-12 * | [A] - 3gpp Ran Wg1, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Further Advancements for E-UTRA Physical Layer Aspects (Release 9) 3GPP TR 36.814 V1.5.0(2009-11)", (20091113), pages 1 - 51, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_59/Docs/R1-095091.zip, (20170509), XP055370428 [A] 1-11 * Sections 8-9 * | International search | [A]CN101442808 (UNIV XIDIAN [CN]); | [A]CN101577940 (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN [CN]); | [A]CN101583194 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]); | [A] - LIU SIYANG, "Coordinated Multiple Point Transmission and Reception in LTE-Advanced systems", TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK TECHNOLOGY, (200909), pages 5 - 9, XP008150009 | [A] - SHEN JIA, "Key Technology Development Trend of LTE-Advanced", MOBILE COMMUNICATION, (200808), vol. 2, pages 20 - 25, XP008150222 |