EP2514234 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UTILIZING COMMUNICATION HISTORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORII, Hiroshi 345 Norfolk Drive Pacifica, California 94044-2020 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 10837098.2 | 25.11.2010 | WO2010FI50963 | Priority number, date | US20090641913 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 641913 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011073504 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514234 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04M1/725, H04L29/08 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | H04W36/00, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSHISTORIE | [2012/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR UTILIZING COMMUNICATION HISTORY | [2012/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À UTILISER UN HISTORIQUE DE COMMUNICATION | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0145368 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 24, line 20 - page 26, line 3 *; | [X]US2004039630 (BEGOLE JAMES M A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] - [0011] - [0013] - [0 15] - [0016] *; | [X]EP1643394 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] - [0077] - [0078] *; | [X]WO2006038962 (SIEMENS COMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [1042] - [1045] * | International search | [A]US2008032678 (SURESH NARASIMHA [IN]); | [A]US2009131080 (NADLER SIMA [IL], et al); | [A]US2009176520 (B S SHREYAS [IN], et al); | [A]US2009234909 (STRANDELL TONI PETER [FI], et al); | [A]US2009265236 (SCHULTZ PAUL T [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0145368 | US2004039630 | EP1643394 | WO2006038962 |