EP2513954 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR LIQUID TREATMENT OF A WAFER SHAPED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lam Research AG SEZ-Strasse 1 9500 Villach / AT | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Dieter Dr. Karl Rennerweg 8 A-9220 Lind ob Velden / AT | 02 /
PUGGL, Michael Eitweg 95 A-9421 Eitweg / AT | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Kontrus, Gerhard SEZ-Strasse 1 9500 Villach / AT | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 10837141.0 | 02.12.2010 | WO2010IB55550 | Priority number, date | US20090642117 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 642117 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011073840 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513954 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302, H01L21/67, H01L21/02 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H01L21/67051 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02052 (KR);
H01L21/6708 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/6715 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67253 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/6838 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | H01L21/302 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLÜSSIGBEHANDLUNG WAFERFÖRMIGER ARTIKEL | [2012/43] | English: | DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR LIQUID TREATMENT OF A WAFER SHAPED ARTICLE | [2012/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITEMENT LIQUIDE D'UN ARTICLE EN FORME DE TRANCHE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 22.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4350562 (BONUE BONUE) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 34-36 * * column 3, lines 46-61 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4903717 (SUMNITSCH FRANZ [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-22,63-68 * * column 2, lines 1,2 * * column 3, lines 37-50 * * column 4, lines 5-11,33-48 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5705223 (BUNKOFSKE RAYMOND JAMES [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 7-11,25-41 * * column 2, lines 18-53 * * column 3, lines 30-67 * * column 4, lines 1-11 * * column 5, lines 1-12 * * column 5, lines 32-39 * * claim 1 ** figure 1 *; | [YA]US6328846 (LANGEN KURT [AT], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-15 * claim 1 * * column 1, lines 21-25,34-43,50-67 * * figures 1-3B * [A] 5,6; | [A]US2003073309 (EMAMI RAMIN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2C-3B *; | [A]US2004092128 (GRANT CASEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 2,6,7 * * page 2, paragraph 25 * * figure 3 *; | [YA]US2004255985 (XIA CHANGFENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-15 * pages 2,3, paragraph 21 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,6 | International search | [A]JP2001070859 (TAKATA CORP); | [A]US2004055707 (SATO MASANOBU [JP], et al); | [A]US2005193952 (GOODMAN MATT G [US], et al); | [A]US2007087568 (KOYATA SAKAE [JP], et al) |