EP2514718 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MESOPOROUS SILICA PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Toshihiro c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
KOMATSU, Masaki c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
HOSOKAWA, Hiroji c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Jun c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10837599.9 | 14.12.2010 | WO2010JP72476 | Priority number, date | JP20090287843 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009287843 | JP20100021413 | 02.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010021413 | [2012/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011074573 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514718 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/00, C01B33/18, C09D7/12, C09D201/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/18 (EP,US);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C09C1/3063 (EP,US);
C09D7/42 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
C23C18/1212 (EP,US);
C23C18/122 (EP,US);
C23C18/1245 (EP,US);
C23C18/127 (EP,US);
C01P2002/70 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/34 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K7/26 (EP,US);
C23C18/1254 (EP,US);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
Y10S977/89 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MESOPORÖSEN SILICAPARTIKELN | [2012/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MESOPOROUS SILICA PARTICLES | [2012/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DE SILICE MÉSOPOREUSE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2012 | Translation filed | 05.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1502898 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0011] - [0099] *; | [A]EP2078696 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0013] - [0036] - [0059] *; | [A] - JIAWEI WANG ET AL, "Synthesis of mesoporous silica hollow spheres in supercritical CO2/water systems", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20060314), vol. 16, no. 18, doi:10.1039/b601301e, ISSN 0959-9428, page 1751, XP055071656 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b601301e | International search | [A]JP2006102592 (SHIGA PREF GOV, et al); | [A]JP2007119765 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2007182341 (NICHIAS CORP); | [A]JP2008110905 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2008150229 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2008535756 (UNIVERSITY COLLEGE CORK - NATIONAL UNIVERSITY OF IRELAND, CORK); | [A]JP2009203285 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008150229 | - MEYLAN, W M.; P. H. HOWARD., "Atom/fragment contribution method for estimating octanol-water partition coefficients", J. PHARM. SCI., (1995), vol. 84, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600840120, pages 83 - 92, XP001181685 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600840120 |