EP2514091 - DIFFERENTIAL GM-BOOSTING CIRCUIT AND APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Networks Spain, S.L. Llacuna 56-70 Building A-8th Floor 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOFILL-PETIT, Adrià C/o Gigle Networks Inc. 255 Shoreline Drive Suite 550 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
REDONDO-NAVARRO, Xavier C/o Gigle Networks Inc. 255 Shoreline Drive Suite 550 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10838056.9 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010US52815 | Priority number, date | US20090639900 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: US 639900 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011075211 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514091 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H03F3/45197 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45134 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45288 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIELLE GM-VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHALTUNG UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2012/43] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL GM-BOOSTING CIRCUIT AND APPLICATIONS | [2012/43] | French: | CIRCUIT D'AMPLIFICATION GM DIFFÉRENTIEL ET APPLICATIONS | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 13.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7202738 (HUIJSING JOHAN HENDRIK [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11 * column 3, line 30 - line 65; figures 8,10 *; | [XI]WO2008090051 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11 * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 32; figures 1,2 * [I] 5; | [X]WO2009087482 (ARCTIC SILICON DEVICES AS [NO]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2319418 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2006267686 (LUO WENZHE [CN], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005134329 (LEE BEAUNG W [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6639457 (LOU CHIH-HONG [TW]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5856757 (ESCHAUZIER RUDOLPHE G [US]); | [Y]US7102433 (LEE JEONG-WON [KR], et al); | [A]US7202740 (LEETE JOHN [US]) | by applicant | US7202738 |