EP2513073 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLEFIN OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENKAN, Selim C/o Laboratory Catalyst Systems LLC 914 Westwood Boulevard Suite 334 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 02 /
SEUBSAI, Anusorn C/o Laboratory Catalyst Systems LLC 914 Westwood Boulevard Suite 334 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2012/43] | Fickert, Stefan Christopher Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10838192.2 | 14.12.2010 | WO2010US60185 | Priority number, date | US20090284324P | 17.12.2009 Original published format: US 284324 P | US20100826445 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 826445 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011075458 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513073 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513073 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/03, C07D301/08 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
C07D301/10 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J23/89 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C07D301/04 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J21/066 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C07D301/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | C07D301/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OLEFINOXIDS | [2012/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLEFIN OXIDE | [2012/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN OXYDE D'OLÉFINE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 05.08.2015 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | RS | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | GB | 14.12.2015 | IE | 14.12.2015 | LU | 14.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6403840 (ZHOU XIAO PING [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 18 - line 23; example -; claim - *; | [E]WO2011075459 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [E] 1-17 * example -; claim - *; | [T] - A. SEUBSAI ET. AL., "New Catalytic Materials for the Direct Epoxidation of Propylene by Molecular Oxygen.", CHEMCATCHEM, (20101104), vol. 3, pages 174 - 179, XP002717919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cctc.201000248 | International search | [Y]US4497908 (LEWIS ROBERT M [US], et al); | [X]US6362349 (KUPERMAN ALEX [US], et al); | [Y]US6765101 (BHASIN MADAN MOHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US6362349 | - APPL. CATAL. A, (2007), vol. 316, page 142 | - CATAL. LETT., (2008), vol. 121, page 33 | - J. CATAL., (2006), vol. 239, page 105 | - JJ. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2005), vol. 109, page 23500 | - IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2003), vol. 42, page 1571 | - J. CATAL., (2002), vol. 211, page 552 | - APPL. CATAL. A, (2005), vol. 294, page 34 | - J. CATAL., (2007), vol. 248, page 235 | - APPL. CATAL. A, (2003), vol. 240, page 243 |