EP2517029 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING PWM WAVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Circuit No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | For all designated states Shenzhen BYD Auto R&D Company Limited Part B, 1/F, Bldg Nº B2, Yucan Industrial Area Lanzhu Road, Shenzhen Export Processing Zone Shenzhen Grand Industrial Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yu No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Xiaofeng No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jianhua No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10838666.5 | 21.12.2010 | WO2010CN80050 | Priority number, date | CN200910189235 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910189235 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076103 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517029 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R29/02, G01R27/02 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G01R29/0273 (EP,US);
G01R29/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | G01R29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PWM-WELLEN | [2012/44] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING PWM WAVE | [2012/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'UNE ONDE À MODULATION D'IMPULSION EN DURÉE (PWM) | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009102514 (HSU LU-YUEH [TW]) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [ 19 ] - [0 21] *; | [A]US5367200 (LEONIDA DAN [CA]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 4 * * column 3, paragraph 1 * * column 4, line 8 - line 11 *; | [A]EP1582882 (TERADYNE INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0957605 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS57208473 (GEN CORP); | [A]JPS57208474 (GEN CORP); | [X]JPH1038907 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [A]US2005225351 (CHEN TSENG-WEN [TW], et al); | [Y]US2009102514 (HSU LU-YUEH [TW]) |