EP2516526 - PROCESS FOR DELAMINATION OF LAMINATED PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mukhopadhyay, Ashutosh Flat No.10 Swawalambi CHS Sector-4, Airoli Navi, Mumbai 400 708 / IN | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön & Partner Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10838832.3 | 20.12.2010 | WO2010IN00825 | Priority number, date | IN2009MUM2932 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: IN 2932MU2009 | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/44] | IN2009MUM2932 | 21.12.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011077450 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2516526 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/06, B32B43/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
B32B43/006 (EP,US);
B32B2311/24 (EP,US);
B32B2317/12 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C08J11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DELAMINIERUNG EINER LAMINIERTEN VERPACKUNG | [2012/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR DELAMINATION OF LAMINATED PACKAGING | [2012/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSTRATIFICATION D'UN EMBALLAGE STRATIFIÉ | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 09.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004031274 (MUKHOPADHYAY ASHUTOSH [IN]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,2,4,9-11 * [Y] 5-10; | [XY]DE4306347 (THIELE ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-4,6-10 * [Y] 5-10; | [Y]JP2006289224 (TETRA PAK JAPAN) [Y] 5-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004129372 (HUANG CHAO-KUO [TW], et al) [Y] 5-10 * claim 1 * | International search | [X]DE4306347 (THIELE ANDREAS [DE]); | [X]JP2006289224 (TETRA PAK JAPAN); | [X]US2004129372 (HUANG CHAO-KUO [TW], et al); | [A]CN101195687 (FENG LIN [CN]) |