EP2517667 - ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/24] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Tadanobu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights, Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KITAMURA, Yoshihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights, Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10839252.3 | 15.12.2010 | [2017/24] | WO2010JP72515 | Priority number, date | JP20090294635 | 25.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009294635 | [2012/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011078019 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517667 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517667 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/22, A61C17/34 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A46B13/02 (KR);
A61C17/225 (EP,US);
A61C17/32 (KR);
A61C17/3481 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | A61C17/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2012/44] | English: | ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH | [2012/44] | French: | BROSSE À DENTS ÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | Translation filed | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 05.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2010 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | GB | 15.12.2017 | IE | 15.12.2017 | LU | 15.12.2017 | MT | 15.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 15.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.12.2017 | ||
MT | 15.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP3134115U (KYOWAKOGYO CO., LTD.) [X] 1,3,6,18-21 * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 2,4,5,7-17,22-27; | [XAYI]JP2004057534 (ASAHI IRIKA KK) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0036] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 3,6-17,19-21,24-27 [Y] 2,4,5,22,23 [I] 1; | [IAY]JP2005261462 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 7,13-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0021] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1-6,9,11,12,18-27 [Y] 8,10,16,17; | [Y]WO2008026383 (OMRON HEALTHCARE CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * examples 1 to 5 * * figures 1-18 *; | [YA]JP2008212200 (ASAHI IRIKA KK) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0010] - [0031] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 22,23; | [Y]JPH08299372 (SUNSTAR INC) [Y] 10,17 * paragraphs [0016] - [0025] * * figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US2007163061 (SORRENTINO ALAN V [US]) [Y] 2,4,5,22,23 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS644222U (ISAMU KATO) [A] 22,23 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006167382 (ASAHI IRIKA KK) [A] 13 * pages 4-5 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US2005102774 (DROSSLER MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 14 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH07327739 (TWIN BIRD IND) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2003245288 (ASAHI IRIKA KK, et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP3134115U (KYOWAKOGYO CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH0684928U (SUNSTAR INC.); | [Y]JPH08299372 (SUNSTAR INC); | [Y]JPH07327739 (TWIN BIRD IND); | [A]JPS644222U (ISAMU KATO); | [A]JPH0810705 (KOBAYASHI RYOICHI); | [A]JPH0642661Y (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JPH09168554 |