EP2519009 - DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR IMAGE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIFUJI, Takafumi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10839296.0 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010JP72734 | Priority number, date | JP20090294548 | 25.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009294548 | [2012/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011078066 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519009 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N13/00, H04N13/02 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | H04N13/00, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR BILDVERARBEITUNG | [2012/44] | English: | DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR IMAGE PROCESSING | [2012/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME PERMETTANT UN TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | Translation filed | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5825456 (TABATA SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 5, line 1 - line 4; figures 8,10,11,12 * * column 6, line 56 - line 62 * * column 9, line 20 - column 11, line 18 *; | [Y]US2001038413 (PELEG SHMUEL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0027] , [0029] , [0033] , [0037] - [0040] - [0043] - [0047] - [0051] *; | [A]US2006268103 (KWEON IN S [KR], et al) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0052]; figures 9A-9C *; | [T] - Daniel Scharstein; Richard Szeliski, "A Taxonomy and Evaluation of Dense Two-Frame StereoCorrespondence Algorithms", International Journal of Computer Vision, vol. 47, (20021231), URL: http://research.microsoft.com/apps/pubs/default.aspx?id=64200, (20131001), XP002714004 [T] 2,3 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1014573219977 | International search | [A]JPH06225202 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPH08322004 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2003524927 (YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSA) | by applicant | JP3168443B |