EP2518069 - CYCLIC AMINE COMPOUND AND ACARICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAMOTO Isami c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 02 /
KOIZUMI Keiji c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 03 /
YANO Makio c/o Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | 04 /
KAWAGUCHI Masahiro c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 05 /
NOMURA Hazumi c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 06 /
HARUYAMA Tetsuya c/o Takaoka Plant Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 300 Mukainohonmachi Takaoka-shi Toyama 933-8507 / JP | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10839311.7 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010JP72766 | Priority number, date | JP20090289576 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009289576 | JP20100039839 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010039839 | JP20100117392 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010117392 | [2012/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011078081 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518069 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N43/58, A01N43/90, A01N43/40, C07D451/06, A01N43/42, A01P7/02, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/58 (EP,US);
C07D451/06 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/42 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C07D451/06, A01N43/42, A01P7/02, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | 13.06.2012 | ME | 13.06.2012 | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHE AMINVERBINDUNG UND AKARIZID | [2012/44] | English: | CYCLIC AMINE COMPOUND AND ACARICIDE | [2012/44] | French: | COMPOSÉ AMINE CYCLIQUE ET ACARICIDE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | Translation filed | 13.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 17.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0200683 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 7,9 * claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0467848 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 7,9 * page 10, line 40 - page 11, line 1 * * example 5; compound L *; | [A]EP1439169 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * table 37 * * paragraph [[0224]] - paragraph [[0226]] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO03017764 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 23, paragraph fourth * * table 1 * * claim 1 * | [X] - SOSNOVSKY G ET AL, "Preparation of 4-Phosphorylated 1,4-Dihydroxy-2,2,6,6-tetramethylpiperidines by Reduction of Nitroxyls with L-Ascorbic Acid", SYNTHESIS,, (19770901), doi:10.1055/S-1977-24500, pages 619 - 622, XP007913266 [X] 7,9 * compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1977-24500 | International search | [X]WO2008103613 (OTHERA HOLDING INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008101195 (OTHERA HOLDING INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0071536 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [A]JPH08508277 (SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.) | [X] - SATO, S. ET AL., "Novel glycosylation of the nitroxyl radicals with peracetylated glycosyl fluorides using a combination of BF3-OEt2 and an amine base as promoters", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 334, no. 3, pages 215 - 222, XP008158734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(01)00184-7 | by applicant | JPH0834784 | US5286865 | WO2005095380 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2007), vol. 48, pages 1683 - 1686 |