EP2517573 - FLAVOR-IMPROVING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSANAI, Hiroki c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
TAKAKURA, Yukiko c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10839604.5 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010JP73488 | Priority number, date | JP20090289510 | 21.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009289510 | [2012/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011078376 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517573 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517573 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2517573 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22, A23L1/226, A23L1/231 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A23L27/26 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/202 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/2024 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/2052 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | A23L1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHMACKSVERBESSERNDES MATERIAL | [2012/44] | English: | FLAVOR-IMPROVING MATERIAL | [2012/44] | French: | AROMATISANT | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2012 | Translation filed | 23.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2010 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | IE | 17.12.2015 | LU | 17.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2005015683 (KAWASAKI KIYOMITSU) [X] 1,6,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7-9 | International search | [X]JP2006124490 (KAWASAKI KIYOMITSU); | [X]JP2008263903 (OGAWA & CO LTD); | [X]JP2008263902 (OGAWA & CO LTD); | [X]JPH05316959 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD); | [X]WO2009011598 (FONTERRA CO OPERATIVE GROUP [NZ], et al) | by applicant | - MURIEL; ELENA; ANTEQUERA; TERESA; PETRON; MARIA JESUS; MARTIN; DIANA; RUIZ; JORGE, "Volatile compounds on the surface and within Iberian dry-cured loin", EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 219, no. 5, pages 445 - 451 | - GARCIA-ESTEBAN; MARTA; ANSORENA; DIANA; ASTIASARAN; ICIAR; MARTIN; DIANA; RUIZ; JORGE, "Comparison of simultaneous distillation extraction (SDE) and solid-phase microextraction (SPME) for the analysis of volatile compounds in dry-cured ham", BROMATOLOGIA, JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2004), vol. 84, no. 11, pages 1364 - 1370 | - I. NOLEAU; B. TOULEMONDE; LEBENSM-WISS. U., "Volatile components of roasted chicken fat.", TECHNOL., (1987), vol. 20, pages 37 - 41 |