EP2517007 - METHODS AND KITS FOR IDENTYFING HUMAN ADENOVIRUS SEROTYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 6720-A Rockledge Drive, Suite 100 Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 1401 Rockville Pike Suite 600 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASHINGTON, Cicely 42 Red Rock Irvine, CA 92604 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840027.6 | 20.12.2010 | WO2010US61256 | Priority number, date | US20090289458P | 23.12.2009 Original published format: US 289458 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079064 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517007 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, C12P19/34 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON SEROTYPEN HUMANER ADENOVIREN | [2012/44] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR IDENTYFING HUMAN ADENOVIRUS SEROTYPES | [2012/44] | French: | MÉTHODES ET KITS POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE SÉROTYPES D'ADÉNOVIRUS HUMAINS | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 04.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6268222 (CHANDLER MARK B [US], et al) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007086904 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 13,15 * abstract * * see especially SEQ ID NO:67 *; | [YD] - SARANTIS H ET AL, "COMPREHENSIVE DETECTION AND SEROTYPING OF HUMAN ADENOVIRUSES BY PCR AND SEQUENCING", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (20040901), vol. 42, no. 9, doi:10.1128/JCM.42.9.3963-3969.2004, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 3963 - 3969, XP007900567 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * * see especially page 3964, column 2, 2nd paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.9.3963-3969.2004 | [YD] - XU W H AND ERDMAN D D, "Type-specific identification of human adenovirus 3, 7, and 21 by a multiplex PCR assay", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 64, pages 537 - 542, XP002699385 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmv.1083 | [Y] - MAHONY J ET AL, "Development of a Respiratory Virus Panel Test for Detection of Twenty Human Respiratory Viruses by Use of Multiplex PCR and a Fluid Microbead-Based Assay", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 45, no. 9, doi:10.1128/JCM.02436-06, ISSN 0095-1137, (20070901), pages 2965 - 2970, (20070627), XP002614446 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.02436-06 | [Y] - NOLTE F S ET AL., "MultiCode-PLx system for multiplexed detection of seventeen respiratory viruses", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200709), vol. 45, pages 2779 - 2786, XP002699386 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.00669-07 | [AD] - GU Z ET AL, "Multiplexed, real-time PCR for quantitative detection of human adenovirus", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, (20031001), vol. 41, no. 10, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 4636 - 4641, XP009147369 [AD] 1 * the whole document * | [AD] - METZGAR D ET AL., "PCR analysis of Egyptian Respiratory adenovirus isolates, including identification of species, serotypes, and coinfections", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200511), vol. 43, pages 5743 - 5752, XP002699387 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.43.11.5743-5752.2005 | International search | [A]WO2008048269 (COMBIMATRIX CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2009047665 (HALL THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US2009098126 (EBNER KARIN [AT], et al); | [A]US2009305229 (MCBRIDE MARY [US], et al) | [X] - LEE ET AL., "High-throughput, sensitive, and accurate multiplex PCR-microsphere flow cytometry system for large-scale comprehensive detection of respiratory viruses.", J CLIN MICROBIOL., (2007), vol. 45, no. 8, pages 2626 - 34 | [A] - METZGAR ET AL., "Evaluation and validation of a real-time PCR assay for detection and quantitation of human adenovirus 14 from clinical samples.", PLOS ONE., (20090917), vol. 4, no. 9, page E7081 | [A] - XU ET AL., "Type-specific identification of human adenovirus 3, 7, and 21 by a multiplex PCR assay.", J MED VIRO, (2001), vol. 64, pages 537 - 542 | [A] - WONG ET AL., "Detection of abroad range of human adenoviruses in respiratory tract samples using a sensitive multiplex real-time PCR assay.", J MED VIRAL, (2008), vol. 80, pages 856 - 65 | [A] - KRUNIC ET AL., "xTAG RVP assay: analytical and clinical performance.", J. CLIN. VIROL., (2007), vol. 40, no. SUPPL., pages S39 - S46 | [A] - MERANTE ET AL., "Principles of the xTAG respiratory viral panel assay (RVP assay).", J. CLIN. VIROL., (2007), vol. 40, no. SUPPL., pages S31 - S35 | [A] - KUO ET AL., "A new set of PCR assays for the identification of multiple human adenovirus species in environmental samples.", J APPL MICROBIOL., (200910), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 1219 - 29 | [A] - MILLER ET AL., "Basic concepts of microarrays and potential applications in clinical microbiology.", CLIN MICROBIOL REV., (200910), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 611 - 33 | [A] - HOUNG ET AL., "Adenovirus Microsatellite Reveals Dynamics of Transmission during a Recent Epidemic of Human Adenovirus Serotype 14 Infection.", J CLIN MICROBIOL., (200907), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 2243 - 2248 | [XP] - WASHINGTON ET AL., "Multiplexed Luminex xMAP Assay for Detection and Identification of Five Adenovirus Serotypes Associated with Epidemics of Respiratory Disease in Adults.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (201006), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 2217 - 2222 | [A] - HOUNG ET AL., "Emergence of a new human adenovirus type 4 (Ad4) genotype:identification of a novel inverted terminal repeated (ITR) sequence from majority of Ad4 isolates from US military recruits.", J CLIN VIROL, (2006), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 381 - 387 | [A] - HUANG ET AL., "Development of multiplexed real-time quantitative polymerase chain reaction assay for detecting human adenoviruses.", DIAGN MICROBIOL INFECT DIS., (2008), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 263 - 71 | [A] - MIURA-OCHIAI ET AL., "Quantitative detection and rapid identification of human adenoviruses.", J CLIN MICROBIOL, (2007), vol. 45, pages 958 - 967 | [A] - DAMEN ET AL., "Real-time PCR with an internal control for detection of all known human adenovirus serotypes.", J CLIN MICROBIO, (2008), vol. 146, pages 3997 - 4003 | [A] - DUNBAR., "Applications of Luminex xMAP technology for rapid, high-throughput multiplexed nucleic acid detection.", CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (2006), vol. 363, pages 71 - 82 |