EP2472668 - METHOD FOR REALIZING TERMINAL ANTENNA, TERMINAL ANTENNA AND TERMINAL THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Weitao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Fengyu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2015/07] |
Former [2012/27] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10840352.8 | 30.04.2010 | WO2010CN72374 | Priority number, date | CN20091266519 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910266519 | [2012/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079562 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2472668 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2472668 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/44, H01Q1/48 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/27] | H01Q1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENDGERÄTANTENNE, ENDGERÄTANTENNE UND ENDGERÄT DAFÜR | [2012/27] | English: | METHOD FOR REALIZING TERMINAL ANTENNA, TERMINAL ANTENNA AND TERMINAL THEREOF | [2012/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN ANTENNE DE TERMINAL, ANTENNE DER TERMINAL AINSI RÉALISÉE ET TERMINAL ASSOCIÉ | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2012 | Translation filed | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BE | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | IT | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | IE | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | LU | 30.04.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | PT | 11.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
PT | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.02.2015 | |
NO | 11.05.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009061966 (YANG GUANGLI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 28] - [0030] *; | [I]WO2009000815 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 9 * * page 14, lines 19-27 *; | [I]US2009179802 (TSAI TIAO-HSING [TW], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] *; | [A]US6545642 (DOUB MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 53 *; | [A]US2008166004 (SANFORD EMERY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0055] *; | [A]US6218992 (SADLER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 7a,7b * * column 6, lines 35-65 * | International search | [A]CN1643727 (CENTURION WIRELESS TECH INC [US]); | [A]CN1917281 (HAIER CO [CN]); | [A]CN101505000 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |