EP2521390 - METHOD FOR CARRIER AGGREGATION AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/11] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAO, Xinxi ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Xiaodong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LAI, Zhengrong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
MA, Zhifeng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Guang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840369.2 | 12.06.2010 | [2017/11] | WO2010CN73889 | Priority number, date | CN200910260737 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910260737 | [2012/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079579 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521390 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521390 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/10 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04L5/0028 (EP,US);
H04L5/0087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRÄGERAUFNAHME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN SPEKTRUMSZUWEISUNG | [2012/45] | English: | METHOD FOR CARRIER AGGREGATION AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ALLOCATION | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALLOCATION DE SPECTRE DYNAMIQUE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | Translation filed | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2010 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | IE | 12.06.2017 | LU | 12.06.2017 | MT | 12.06.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.06.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
MT | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.06.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
MT | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.06.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
MT | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.06.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
MT | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
MT | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009059820 (JUNG YOUNG-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4,11-13 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * [A] 5-10; | [YA]US2007286156 (GORMLEY EAMONN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,11-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * [A] 5-10; | [YA]US2008151788 (GORMLEY EAMONN F [US]) [Y] 1-4,11-13 * paragraph [0048]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0052] * [A] 5-10; | [Y]WO2009104435 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,11-13 * abstract *; | EP2247132 [ ] (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0055] * | International search | [X]US2009059820 (JUNG YOUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [X]US2007286156 (GORMLEY EAMONN F [US], et al); | [Y]CN1965513 (WALTICAL SOLUTIONS INC [US]); | [XP]CN101729125 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO); | [XP]CN101730112 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO); | [E]CN101778392 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) |