EP2511992 - WIRED EARPHONE COMPATIBLE METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Chengdong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Konggang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Hailong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Tongbang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 DE-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840509.3 | 16.12.2010 | WO2010CN79846 | Priority number, date | CN200910249586 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910249586 | [2012/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079720 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2511992 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H04R1/10 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
H01R29/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/58 (EP,KR,US);
H01R27/00 (EP,US);
H04R1/10 (KR);
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
H01R2105/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | MIT KABELKOPFHÖRER KOMPATIBLES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2012/42] | English: | WIRED EARPHONE COMPATIBLE METHOD AND DEVICE | [2012/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF COMPATIBLES AVEC DES ÉCOUTEURS CÂBLÉS | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2012 | Translation filed | 12.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 10.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006182047 (IBE YUKIYASU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 3, paragraph 46 *; | [X]US6856046 (SCARLETT SHAWN W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15 * column 1, line 43 - column 6, line 27 *; | [X]US2009136058 (CHOI KYU WON [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2002141980 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-3,8-10,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US6397087 (KIM DONG-HO [KR], et al); | [X]CN201142743Y (QINGDAO HISENSE MOBILE COMM [CN]); | [A]CN201188488Y (YIXIN WANG [CN]); | [XP]CN101719610 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |