EP2521391 - METHOD AND BASE STATION COMPRISING AN APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATING EDGE FREQUENCY BAND RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/45] | METHOD, DEVICE AND BASE STATION FOR ALLOCATING EDGE FREQUENCY BAND RESOURCES | ||
[2016/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Zheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Dan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Guohua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HUA, Lin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10840596.0 | 30.12.2010 | [2016/52] | WO2010CN80525 | Priority number, date | CN200910216927 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910216927 | [2012/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079809 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521391 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521391 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, // H04W28/04, H04W88/08 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | H04W72/04, // H04W28/04, H04W48/16, H04W88/08 | ||
Former IPC [2012/45] | H04W16/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON RANDFREQUENZ-BANDRESSOURCEN | [2016/31] | English: | METHOD AND BASE STATION COMPRISING AN APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATING EDGE FREQUENCY BAND RESOURCES | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET STATION DE BASE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF POUR ALLOUER DES RESSOURCES DE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE LIMITE | [2016/31] |
Former [2012/45] | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON RANDFREQUENZ-BANDRESSOURCEN | ||
Former [2012/45] | METHOD, DEVICE AND BASE STATION FOR ALLOCATING EDGE FREQUENCY BAND RESOURCES | ||
Former [2012/45] | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET STATION DE BASE POUR ALLOUER DES RESSOURCES DE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE LIMITE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | Translation filed | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2010 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | IE | 30.12.2016 | LU | 30.12.2016 | MT | 30.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 28.02.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | GB | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
MT | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007108769 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 17 * * page 7, line 3 - page 11, line 17 * * figures 4A,4B,8 *; | [E]EP2326115 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] *; | [I] - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC, "Use case of OI/HII indicators for uplink ICIC", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081910, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080514), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, USA; 20080514, XP050110274 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - FAN XIANGNING ET AL, "An Inter-Cell Interference Coordination Technique Based on Users' Ratio and Multi-Level Frequency Allocations", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING, 2007. WICOM 2007. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070921), ISBN 978-1-4244-1311-9, pages 799 - 802, XP031261381 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections I-III * | [IP] - GUANGRONG ZHANG ET AL, "A Novel Uplink Interference Coordination Scheme Using High Interference Indicator", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE FALL (VTC 2010-FALL), 2010 IEEE 72ND, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100906), ISBN 978-1-4244-3573-9, pages 1 - 5, XP031770517 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]CN101730110 (SHANGHAI HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [A]CN101064905 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [A]CN101291515 (UNIV. BEIJING POSTS & TELECOM); | [A]WO2009098615 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.) |