EP2487677 - COMPOUND SOUND ABSORPTION DEVICE WITH BUILT-IN RESONANT CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute Of Acoustics, Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qian Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
LYU, Yadong Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Jun Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/46] | 01 /
ZHANG, Qian Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | ||
02 /
LU, Yadong Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | |||
03 /
YANG, Jun Institute Of Acoustics Chinese Academy Of Science No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | |||
Former [2012/33] | 01 /
ZHANG, Qian No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | ||
02 /
LU, Yadong No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | |||
03 /
YANG, Jun No.21 North 4th Ring Road West Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10841854.2 | 14.10.2010 | [2020/10] | WO2010CN01613 | Priority number, date | CN20101001223 | 08.01.2010 Original published format: CN201010001223 | [2012/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082510 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487677 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487677 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/172, E04B1/86 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G10K11/172 (EP);
E04B1/86 (EP);
E04B2001/8428 (EP);
E04B2001/8452 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/33] | G10K11/172, G10K11/16, E04B1/84 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDSCHALLABSORPTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINGEBAUTEM RESONANZHOHLRAUM | [2012/33] | English: | COMPOUND SOUND ABSORPTION DEVICE WITH BUILT-IN RESONANT CAVITY | [2012/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPOSITE D'ABSORPTION DES SONS COMPRENANT UNE CAVITÉ RÉSONNANTE INCORPORÉE | [2019/46] |
Former [2012/33] | DISPOSITIF D'ABSORPTION DES SONS COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UNE CAVITÉ RÉSONNANTE INCORPORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2012 | Translation filed | 21.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 16.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2010 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | IE | 14.10.2020 | LU | 14.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5777947 (AHUJA KRISHAN KUMAR [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-5,9 * * column 2, lines 47-65 * * column 4, lines 42-67 * * column 6, lines 6-35 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 26 *; | [I]US6021612 (DUNN STANLEY E [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * figures 3-5,7,8 * * column 6, lines 4-23 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 37 *; | [I]US4600078 (WIRT LESLIE S [US]) [I] 1,5-8 * abstract * * figures 6,7,9,10 *; | [I]GB2005384 (ROLLS ROYCE) [I] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * figure 2b *; | [I]US2005109557 (DRAVET ALAIN [FR], et al) [I] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,2a,2b * * paragraphs [0043] , [0059] , [0060] *; | [I]US2009283356 (TSUGIHASHI KAZUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 9,11,12 *; | [I]EP0965977 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]EP0926656 (GIORA GILLES [FR]) [I] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * * figures 1a,1b,2,4,5 *; | [I]GB2027255 (WELTIN W E) [I] 1,5 * figures 1,3 * | International search | [XP]CN101727894 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS); | [X]US3819007 (WIRT L, et al); | [X]JP2008009014 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [X]CN101139851 (RONGCHU ZHANG [CN]); | [X]US3734234 (WIRT L); | [X]GB1470036 (LOCKHEED AIRCRAFT CORP); | [A]CN101003989 (CHEN JIXUAN [CN]); | [A]CN201199437Y (BEIJING GREENTEC ENGINEERING H [CN]) | Examination | US4189027 | US6098926 |