EP2521805 - INSULATION DEVICE OF SINGLE CRYSTAL GROWTH DEVICE AND SINGLE CRYSTAL GROWTH DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Siltron Inc. 274, Imsu-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-350 / KR | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Hoon 103-507, Jisan Hyundae Mansion Jisan-dong Suseong-gu, Daegu 708-091 / KR | 02 /
OH, Hyun-Jung 104-2102 Daerim e-pyenhansesang apt. Suseong 4 ga Suseong-gu Daegu 706-110 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Il-Soo 101-304 Hyundai apt. Bonggok-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-200 / KR | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/46] | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Hoon 202-1 Yongsan2cha Seohanhwasung Town 919 Yongsan-dong Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-130 / KR | ||
02 /
OH, Hyun-Jung 104-2102 Daerim e-pyenhansesang apt. Suseong 4 ga Suseong-gu Daegu 706-110 / KR | |||
03 /
CHOI, Il-Soo 101-304 Hyundai apt. Bonggok-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-200 / KR | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10842278.3 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010KR04775 | Priority number, date | KR20100000518 | 05.01.2010 Original published format: KR 20100000518 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011083898 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521805 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/00, C30B35/00, C30B29/06, H01L21/02 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C30B35/00 (EP,US);
C30B11/003 (EP,US);
C30B15/14 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE EINZELKRISTALLZÜCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE EINZELKRISTALLZÜCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2012/46] | English: | INSULATION DEVICE OF SINGLE CRYSTAL GROWTH DEVICE AND SINGLE CRYSTAL GROWTH DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2012/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ISOLATION POUR DISPOSITIF DE CROISSANCE DE MONOCRISTAUX ET DISPOSITIF DE CROISSANCE DE MONOCRISTAUX L'INCLUANT | [2012/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 14.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008025872 (OKMETIC OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,7-11,15 * figures 1, 2 * * page 14, line 34 - line 35 * * page 15, line 3 - line 4 * * page 15, line 6 - line 7 * * page 33, line 12 - line 15 * [I] 4-6,12-14; | [XI]JPH07277869 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,2,9,10 * example 2 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 3-8,11-15; | [XI]US2007101932 (SCHOWALTER LEO J [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 2 * [I] 2-8,10-15; | [A]US2009029307 (OHARA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006072634 (TEN FORSCHUNG EV FRAUNHOFER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, lines 13-17 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 3 *; | [A]EP1498515 (KOSTIN VLADIMIR VLADIMIROVICH [RU]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH02157181 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - HUANG L Y ET AL, "On the hot-zone design of Czochralski silicon growth for photovoltaic applications", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040201), vol. 261, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JCRYSGRO.2003.09.039, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 433 - 443, XP004484155 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrysgro.2003.09.039 | International search | [X]JP2009274928 (SUMCO CORP); | [A]JP2009274926 (SUMCO CORP); | [A]JP2001010893 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO); | [A]JP2004137089 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO); | [A]KR100891570B (SILTRON INC [KR]) |