EP2512696 - SULFONATE-FUNCTIONAL COATINGS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JING, Naiyong 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
RIDDLE, Justin A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Xue-hua 8 Xing Yi Road Maxdo Center 38/F Shanghai 200336 / CN | 04 /
OLSON, Erik D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10842633.9 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010US60915 | Priority number, date | US20090287555P | 17.12.2009 Original published format: US 287555 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011084661 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2512696 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512696 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, B08B3/08, C11D1/12 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C09D5/1625 (EP,US);
B05D5/00 (US);
B05D7/04 (US);
B05D7/14 (US);
B05D7/544 (US);
B08B1/143 (US);
C03C17/30 (US);
C09D1/00 (EP,US);
C09D1/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/1662 (EP,US);
C09D5/1693 (EP,US);
C03C2217/20 (US);
C03C2217/75 (US);
C03C2218/11 (US);
C03C2218/32 (US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | B08B3/08, C11D1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFONAT-FUNKTIONELLE BESCHICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/43] | English: | SULFONATE-FUNCTIONAL COATINGS AND METHODS | [2012/43] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS À FONCTIONNALITÉ SULFONATE ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 13.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15172580.1 Application withdrawn : 25.06.2015 | EP15173347.4 / EP2944677 | EP17171754.9 / EP3235883 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2010 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | GB | 17.12.2015 | IE | 17.12.2015 | LU | 17.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 17.12.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006018216 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0102] * * claims 1, 4-6, 22, 28-30 *; | [X]EP1975208 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] ** examples 1-4; claims 1,2,5,8-11 *; | [X]WO2009067565 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 25 - page 5, line 4 * * page 8, line 10 - line 19 * * page 26, line 7 - page 29, line 26 * * figures 1-23; examples 5-7; claims 1-3, 16-19, 21-31 * | International search | [A]US5049437 (TANNENBAUM HARVEY P [US]); | [A]US5626907 (HAGIWARA MINORI [JP], et al); | [A]US6657001 (ANDERSON LAWRENCE G [US], et al); | [A]US2006116482 (MUNDSTOCK HOLGER [DE], et al); | [A]KR100775739B (???????????); | [A]WO2008015364 (ESSILOR INT [FR], et al) | Examination | EP0933377 |