EP2516600 - AN APPARATUS, COMPONENTS AND OPERATING METHODS FOR CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED TRANSPORT GASIFIERS AND REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Company Services Inc. 241 Ralph Mcgill Blvd. Atlanta, GA 30308 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Guohai 1248 Eagle Park Road Birmingham AL 35242 / US | 02 /
VIMALCHAND, Pannalal 689 Highland Lakes Cove Birmingham AL 35242 / US | 03 /
PENG, Wan, Wang 944 Talon Way Birmingham AL 35242 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10842679.2 | 20.12.2010 | [2017/26] | WO2010US61259 | Priority number, date | US20100969997 | 16.12.2010 Original published format: US 969997 | US20090288533P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288533 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011084734 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2516600 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2516600 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/56, C10L3/00, C10J3/72, C10J3/54, C10J3/84, C10K1/02, F23C10/00, F23C10/10 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
C10J3/56 (EP,KR,US);
C10J3/721 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
C10K1/024 (EP,US);
C10L3/00 (KR);
F23C10/002 (EP,US);
F23C10/005 (EP,US);
F23C10/10 (EP,US);
C10J2200/152 (EP,US);
C10J2300/093 (EP,US);
C10J2300/094 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1807 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C10J3/56, C10L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN ZUR ZIRKULIERENDE FLIESSBETTTRANSPORTVERGASER UND -REAKTOREN | [2012/44] | English: | AN APPARATUS, COMPONENTS AND OPERATING METHODS FOR CIRCULATING FLUIDIZED BED TRANSPORT GASIFIERS AND REACTORS | [2012/44] | French: | APPAREIL, COMPOSANTS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FONCTIONNEMENT PERMETTANT DE FAIRE CIRCULER DES RÉACTEURS ET DES GAZOGÈNES DE TRANSPORT À LIT FLUIDISÉ | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0634471 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [X] 1,2,12 * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 58; figure 3 * [I] 3-11,13-15; | [A]EP0161970 (FRAMATOME & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2586941 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR100460217B (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY); | [A]WO2008107928 (IHI CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP0634470 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]); | [A]US2008216655 (VIMALCHAND PANNALAL [US], et al); | [A]JP2009227704 (IHI CORP) | by applicant | EP0634471 | US6631698 | US5560900 |