EP2461549 - MOBILE PHONE INTERNET FLOW COUNTING AND DISPLAYING METHOD, DEVICE, AND MOBILE PHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Zhiquan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2015/48] |
Former [2012/23] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10842908.5 | 20.12.2010 | [2015/48] | WO2010CN79980 | Priority number, date | CN20101000578 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: CN201010000578 | [2012/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011085626 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461549 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2461549 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/247, H04M15/28, H04M15/30, H04W4/24, H04W4/26, H04W88/02, H04L12/14 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04L12/141 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04W8/183 (CN,US);
H04L12/1464 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/30 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/77 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/774 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/8214 (US);
H04M15/83 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/835 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/8355 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/84 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/844 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/85 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/852 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/857 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W4/24 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/18 (CN);
H04L12/1435 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/1439 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | H04M1/247 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZÄHLUNG UND ANZEIGE DES INTERNETDATENFLUSSES EINES MOBILTELEFONS, VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR UND MOBILTELEFON | [2012/23] | English: | MOBILE PHONE INTERNET FLOW COUNTING AND DISPLAYING METHOD, DEVICE, AND MOBILE PHONE | [2012/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPTAGE ET D'AFFICHAGE DE DÉBIT INTERNET DE TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE, DISPOSITIF ET TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | Translation filed | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 25.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15179360.1 / EP2958303 | EP16163150.2 / EP3068114 | EP18203906.5 / EP3471384 | EP21192942.7 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 25.11.2015 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | MT | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | RS | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | IE | 20.12.2015 | LU | 20.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MK | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
RS | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 25.11.2015 | |
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 25.11.2015 | |
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 25.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9219078 (COMVIK GSM AB [SE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101600186 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [Y]CN1464732 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]CN1885889 (INVENTEC SHANGHAI ELECTRONICS [CN]); | [Y]CN101183950 (LG ELECTRONICS CHINA RES & DEV [CN]); | [Y]CN101459523 (LANGCHAO LG DIGITAL MOBILE COM [CN]); | [XP]CN101800792 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) | Examination | US2007117551 | US2008045179 | US2008261603 | WO2011085626 |