EP2530781 - COUPLER FOR A COAXIAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obshchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennostyu "Veritel" Pr. Bolshoy Koptevsky 3-1 Moscow 125315 / RU | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUKATOV, Mikhail Dmitrievich Zagorodnoe Shosse 9-2-8 Moscow 117152 / RU | 02 /
KOMLEV, Valery Nikolaevich ul. Verkhnyaya Maslovka 27-1-19 Moscow 127083 / RU | 03 /
KNYAZEV, Igor Gennadevich ul. Chkalova 7-311 pos. Nakhabino Krasnogorsky r-n Moskovskaya obl. 143432 / RU | 04 /
KLIMASHOV, Ilya Aleksandrovich ul. Novomarinskaya 15-57 Moscow 109451 / RU | 05 /
RUZHIN, Oleg Konstantinovich ul. Studeny Proezd 4-6-1 Moscow 127282 / RU | 06 /
SHESTOV, Andrei Vladimirovich Bulvar Matrosa Zheleznyaka 33-1-69 Moscow / RU | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2015/18] |
Former [2012/49] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10844829.1 | 14.10.2010 | WO2010RU00585 | Priority number, date | RU20100102804 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: RU 2010102804 | [2012/49] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011093739 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | RU | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530781 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530781 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/02, H01R24/42, H01R24/54, H01P5/18, H01R13/66, H01R103/00 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H01P5/026 (EP);
H01P5/183 (EP);
H01R24/42 (EP);
H01R24/54 (EP);
H01R13/6625 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | H01P5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPPLER FÜR EIN KOAXIALKABEL | [2012/49] | English: | COUPLER FOR A COAXIAL CABLE | [2012/49] | French: | COUPLEUR POUR CÂBLE COAXIAL | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2012 | Translation filed | 15.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2010 | AL | 29.04.2015 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | RS | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | IE | 14.10.2015 | LU | 14.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5689218 (STEIN RICHARD P [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * column 2, line 21 - line 41; figure 1a * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 26; figures 5a-6b *; | [XI]US5171162 (KAUFMAN THEODORE P [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 15 - line 60; figures 1-5 * [I] 6,7; | [A]US2004222867 (ANTKOWIAK MAREK EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2694182 (EDLEN GEORGE G, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 71 - column 2, line 70; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]RU56072U (ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO "AVTOMATIZIROVANNYE NIFORMATSINNYE SI); | [A]RU2327262 (FEDERAL NOE GUP TSENTRAL NYJ N [RU]); | [A]SU1062815 (SEMENCHENKO VALENTINA [SU]); | [A]US4481641 (GABLE MELVIN G [US], et al); | [A]JPH09275307 (DAIICHI DENPA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | GB607200 | US4700145 | JPH01103003 | SU1517082 | RU56072U |