EP2534905 - LINK ADAPTATION IN TYPE-II RELAY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/40] |
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Xinghua Ericsson Tower No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
GAN, Jiansong Room 2-101 Building 7 Laizhen Jiayuan Qinghe, Haidian District Beijing 100192 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yin Ericsson Tower No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 04 /
QIAN, Yu 5-1606, Jun An Jia Yuan Xi Qu Xiaoying Qinghe Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Jianfeng Ericsson Tower No. 5 Lize Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/40] |
Former [2012/51] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10845432.3 | 11.02.2010 | [2016/40] | WO2010CN00195 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011097758 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534905 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2534905 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/04, // H04W72/04 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0034 (EP);
H04L2001/0097 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSADAPTION IN EINEM TYP-II-RELAISNETZWERK | [2012/51] | English: | LINK ADAPTATION IN TYPE-II RELAY NETWORK | [2012/51] | French: | ADAPTATION DE LIAISON DANS UN RÉSEAU À RELAIS DE TYPE II | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2010 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | IE | 11.02.2017 | LU | 11.02.2017 | MT | 11.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008142837 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | US2010128622 [ ] (HORIUCHI AYAKO [JP], et al); | International search | [A]EP1926339 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2009010906 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO2009027953 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [A]EP2101528 (INTEL CORP [US]) | by applicant | US2010128622 | WO2003IB04530 | WO2010SE50273 |