EP2537581 - METHOD FOR MAKING A COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST IN WHICH A COBALT CATALYST POWDER IS COATED ONTO THE SURFACE OF A METAL FOAM, THE COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST, A THERMAL-MEDIUM-CIRCULATING HEAT-EXCHANGE REACTOR USING THE COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LIQUID FUEL BY MEANS OF A FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS REACTION USING THE THERMAL-MEDIUM-CIRCULATING HEAT-EXCHANGE REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-343 / KR | [2020/40] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jung-Il 105-1206, Samsung Hanul Apt. Sinseong-Dong Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 305-707 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Ji-Chan 314, Dormitory of KOREA INSTITUTE OF ENERGY RESEARCH 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | 03 /
KO, Chang-Hyun 5-706, Hanmaru Apt. Dunsan-Dong Seo-Gu Daejeon 302-120 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Heon 103-202, Hyundai Apt. Doryong-Dong Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 05 /
CHUN, Dong-Hyun 136-1008, Hanbit Apt. Eoeun-Dong Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2012/52] | Application number, filing date | 10846205.2 | 25.02.2010 | [2020/40] | WO2010KR01187 | Priority number, date | KR20100013851 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100013851 | [2012/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011102567 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537581 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2537581 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/75, B01J37/02, B01J8/02, C10L3/10 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
C10G2/34 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0205 (EP,US);
B01J37/0217 (EP,US);
B01J37/0219 (EP,US);
B01J37/0225 (EP,US);
B01J37/0238 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
B01J8/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOBALTMETALLSCHAUMKATALYSATORS MIT AUF DIE FLÄCHE EINES METALLSCHAUMS AUFGETRAGENEM KOBALTKATALYSATORPULVER, KOBALTMETALLSCHAUMKATALYSATOR, WÄRMETAUSCHERREAKTOR MIT ZIRKULIERENDEM WÄRMEMEDIUM MIT DEM KOBALTMETALLSCHAUMKATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGKRAFTSTOFF MIT EINER FISCHER-TROPSCH-SYNTHESEREAKTION MIT DEM WÄRMETAUSCHERREAKTOR MIT ZIRKULIERENDEM WÄRMEMEDIUM | [2012/52] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST IN WHICH A COBALT CATALYST POWDER IS COATED ONTO THE SURFACE OF A METAL FOAM, THE COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST, A THERMAL-MEDIUM-CIRCULATING HEAT-EXCHANGE REACTOR USING THE COBALT METAL FOAM CATALYST, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LIQUID FUEL BY MEANS OF A FISCHER-TROPSCH SYNTHESIS REACTION USING THE THERMAL-MEDIUM-CIRCULATING HEAT-EXCHANGE REACTOR | [2012/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CATALYSEUR MOUSSE MÉTALLIQUE AU COBALT DANS LEQUEL LA POUDRE DE CATALYSEUR AU COBALT EST APPLIQUÉE SUR LA SURFACE DE MOUSSE MÉTALLIQUE, CATALYSEUR MOUSSE MÉTALLIQUE AU COBALT, RÉACTEUR ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À CIRCULATION DE MILIEU THERMIQUE UTILISANT LE CATALYSEUR MOUSSE MÉTALLIQUE AU COBALT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE PAR RÉACTION DE SYNTHÈSE DE FISCHER-TROPSCH À L'AIDE DU RÉACTEUR ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À CIRCULATION DE MILIEU THERMIQUE | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | Translation filed | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | IE | 25.02.2021 | LU | 25.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003207032 (AHN KIE Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0041] * * claims 1, 9, 10, 15, 20, 25, 26, 30, 33, 36, 37, 39, 40 ** claims 47, 48, 51 *; | [XYI]KR20080060739 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) [X] 7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * embodiments 1, 2 * * claims 1-8, 10-17, 21-24 * [Y] 1-6 [I] 1-6 | International search | [A]WO2005075606 (VELOCYS INC [US], et al); | [A]US7045486 (WANG YONG [US], et al); | [Y]US7160577 (AHN KIE Y [US], et al); | [Y]KR20080060739 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) |