EP2541672 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT AND COLORANT FOR PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeka Corporation 7-2-35, Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Adeka Corporation 7-2-35, Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | |||
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-31-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | ||
For all designated states Adeka Corporation 7-2-35, Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Junji c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1 Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
MONDEN, Atsushi c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1 Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 03 /
SHINKAI, Masahiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1 Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 04 /
AOYAMA, Yohei c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 7-2-35 Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | 05 /
AKIMOTO, Kensaku c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 7-2-35 Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | 06 /
YANO, Toru c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 7-2-35 Higashiogu Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10846655.8 | 27.12.2010 | WO2010JP73519 | Priority number, date | JP20100043481 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010043481 | [2013/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011104992 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541672 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20, H01L51/46 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
H01M14/005 (EP,US);
C09B67/00 (KR);
C09B23/086 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H10K85/652 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | H01M14/00, H01L31/04, H01G9/20, H01L51/46 | ||
Former IPC [2013/01] | H01M14/00, H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | FOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT UND FÄRBEMITTEL FÜR DAS FOTOELEKTRISCHE UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT | [2013/01] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT AND COLORANT FOR PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT | [2013/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ET COLORANT POUR ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUEELEMENT | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2012 | Translation filed | 10.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 07.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007220412 (UNIV GIFU, et al); | [Y]JP2008071535 (KYUSHU INST TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [A]JP2008166119 (TDK CORP); | [AP]WO2010038589 (TDK CORP [JP], et al); | by applicant | JPH08259543 | JPH09507334 | JP2007220412 | JP2008166119 |