EP2543519 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTING BLANKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/02] | PRINTING BLANKET, PRINTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTING BLANKET | ||
[2018/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shuhou Co., Ltd. 5-5 Ohdoro-cho 2-go Fukui-shi Fukui 919-0327 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Shuhou Co., Ltd. 5-5 Ohdoro-cho 2-go Fukui-shi Fukui 919-0327 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAOKA, Kouji 33-4 Kamitonokuchi-cho Sabae-shi Fukui 916-1111 / JP | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2013/02] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10846942.0 | 13.05.2010 | [2019/01] | WO2010JP03236 | Priority number, date | JP20100097747 | 21.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010097747 | JP20100049269 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010049269 | [2013/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011108034 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543519 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2543519 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41N10/02, B41F17/00, B41F13/193 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
B41N10/02 (EP,KR,US);
B41F13/193 (US);
B41F17/001 (EP,US);
B41F17/34 (KR);
B41F3/20 (KR);
B41N10/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | B41N10/02, B41F3/20, B41F17/34, B41N10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DRUCKTUCHES | [2018/33] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTING BLANKET | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BLANCHET D'IMPRESSION | [2018/33] |
Former [2013/02] | DRUCKTUCH, DRUCKER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DRUCKTUCHES | ||
Former [2013/02] | PRINTING BLANKET, PRINTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTING BLANKET | ||
Former [2013/02] | BLANCHET D'IMPRESSION, IMPRIMANTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BLANCHET D'IMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2012 | Translation filed | 05.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2010 | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | IE | 13.05.2019 | LU | 13.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.05.2010 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.05.2010 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0179359 (MARKEM CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 4 - column 7, line 16; figures 1-3 * * column 13, line 12 - column 14, line 26; figure 9 *; | [Y]EP0718098 (TAMPOGRAF S A S DI J E TAYLOR [IT]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 58; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO0245961 (KAARE JOHANSSON [SE]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1 - page 5; figures 2,3 * [Y] 5; | [A]US2006185541 (CZERANKA RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0051] , [0067] - [0070] - [0072]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1795363 (SHUHOU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP1808303 (SHUHOU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0014]; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]CN201268140Y (WENXIN TIAN [CN]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 5 | International search | [A]JPS5747367U (NIPPON KYOKUMEN INSATSUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA); | [X]JPS62132691 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2005111665 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]JP2008114496 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JP2008114496 |