EP2515223 - STORAGE DEVICE INCLUDING A RAID1-TYPE RAID GROUP, AND WRITING CONTROL METHOD TO RAID1-TYPE RAID GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIHARA, Yusuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
MATSUI, Yuko c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
IZUTA, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10847324.0 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010JP01616 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011111089 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2515223 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/20 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F11/2087 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (EP,US);
G06F3/065 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER RAID-GRUPPE VOM TYP RAID1 SOWIE SCHREIBSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE RAID-GRUPPE VOM TYP RAID1 | [2012/43] | English: | STORAGE DEVICE INCLUDING A RAID1-TYPE RAID GROUP, AND WRITING CONTROL METHOD TO RAID1-TYPE RAID GROUP | [2012/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE COMPRENANT UN GROUPE RAID DU TYPE RAID1 ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉCRITURE DANS UN GROUPE RAID DU TYPE RAID1 | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | Translation filed | 20.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1662400 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 3-6,8,13 * figures 3-5 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042] * [A] 1,2,7,9-12,14; | [A]EP1840719 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0129] ** figures 3-13 *; | [XYI]US2009138672 (KATSURAGI EIJU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,14 * figures 1,2,6,9-15,18 * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0226] * [Y] 3-6,8,13 [I] 2,10-12 | International search | [Y]JP2008197864 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2009129201 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2009217519 |