EP2545741 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GRANT-BASED UPLINK TRANSMISSION SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optis Cellular Technology, LLC P.O. Box 250649 Plano, TX 75025 / US | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NÁDAS, Szilveszter Zoltan u. 28. fsz. 2 H-1192 Budapest / HU | 02 /
HÉVIZI, László Béla király u. 66 H-2081 Piliscsaba / HU | 03 /
RÁCZ, Sándor Bem utca 2 H-2700 Cegléd / HU | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10847570.8 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010SE50254 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011112124 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545741 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/10 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
H04W28/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | H04W72/14, H04W28/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR GENEHMIGUNGSBASIERTE UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSZEITPLANUNG | [2013/03] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GRANT-BASED UPLINK TRANSMISSION SCHEDULING | [2013/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PROGRAMMATION D'UNE TRANSMISSION SUR LA LIAISON MONTANTE BASÉE SUR DES AUTORISATIONS | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO2006075951 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO2008066430 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A] - SZILVESZTER NADAS ET AL., "HSUPA Transport Network Congestion Control", EURASIP JOURNAL ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING, vol. 2009, pages 1 - 10, URL: http://downloads.hindawi.com/journals/wcn/2009/924096.pdf, XP003028200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2009/924096 | [A] - SIEMENS, "E-DCH TNL Congestion Control with Soft Handover", 3GPP DRAFT; TSG-RAN WORKING GROUP 3 MEETING #51; TDOC R3-060266, DENVER, USA, (20060213), XP050159211 |