EP2547725 - POLYURETHANE FOAM SCORCH INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt Chemicals, LLC 30 Winfield Street Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Vanderbilt Chemicals, LLC 30 Winfield Street Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc. 30 Winfield Street Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMASSA, John, M. 32 Old Village Lane Trumbull CT 06611 / US | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2013/04] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstraße 58/59 D-10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10848119.3 | 23.09.2010 | [2017/43] | WO2010US49975 | Priority number, date | US20100726950 | 18.03.2010 Original published format: US 726950 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011115642 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2547725 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2547725 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/45, C08K5/10, C08L75/04, C08K5/13 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
C08K5/13 (EP,CN,US);
C08J9/0023 (CN);
C08G18/14 (CN);
C08G18/282 (CN);
C08K5/005 (CN);
C08K5/18 (CN);
C08K5/46 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2110/0008 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/005, C08L75/04 (CN);
C08K5/13, C08L75/04 (CN,EP,US);
C08K5/18, C08L75/04 (CN);
C08K5/46, C08L75/04 (US,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/04] | C08K5/45, C08K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDER POLYURETHANSCHAUM | [2013/04] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOAM SCORCH INHIBITOR | [2013/04] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE ROUSSISSEMENT POUR MOUSSE POLYURÉTHANE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 04.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4363745 (HINZE KENNETH J) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 11 - line 66 * * tables I-V ** claims 1,3-5 * | International search | [Y]US5167844 (SCHUMACHER ROLF [CH], et al); | [Y]US5219892 (SUHOZA RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US5571453 (BARRY LAWRENCE B [US], et al); | [A]US6676849 (DEMASSA JOHN MATTHEW [US]) |