EP2550765 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A TRUST LEVEL TO ACCESS A RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Kun No. 5 Donghuan Zhong Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Hao 8 1201 Zhuangwei Garden Qi Li Zhuang Fengtai District Beijing 100071 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wendong c/o Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | 04 /
CUI, Yidong Room 5-502 Building 5 Yun Qu Garden Hui Long Guan Beijing 102208 / CN | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/05] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 10848190.4 | 26.03.2010 | [2019/01] | WO2010CN71350 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011116528 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550765 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550765 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L29/06, G06Q50/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L63/108 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER SICHERHEITSSTUFE FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF EINE RESSOURCE | [2013/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A TRUST LEVEL TO ACCESS A RESOURCE | [2013/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ACCORDER UN NIVEAU DE CONFIANCE ET D'AUTORISER AINSI L'ACCÈS À UNE RESSOURCE | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 15.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2010 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | IE | 26.03.2019 | LU | 26.03.2019 | MT | 26.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | GB | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
MT | 26.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GB | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007076297 (DAVIS JOHN STANNARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054]; figures 7-10,14; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]WO2007115209 (NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [XY]WO2009105552 (WILLIAMS SUSAN BARNHARDT [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068]; figures 2,3,6,7,8; claims 1-4,6,10-13,15,20 * [Y] 2-8,10-17; | [YA] - WILFRED VILLEGAS ET AL, "An Access Control Scheme for Protecting Personal Data", PRIVACY, SECURITY AND TRUST, 2008. PST '08. SIXTH ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081001), ISBN 978-0-7695-3390-2, pages 24 - 35, XP031345637 [Y] 2-8,10-17 * page 26, line 1, paragraph r - page 29, line 19, paragraph l * * page 30, line 3, paragraph r - page 31, line 15, paragraph l * [A] 1,9 | International search | [Y]WO2007076297 (DAVIS JOHN STANNARD [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007115209 (NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al); | [A]US2007239684 (ANDERSON STEPHEN N [US], et al); | [A]US2009199264 (LANG DAVID E [US]) |