EP2551386 - META-FORM WHOLLY AROMATIC POLYAMIDE FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIUE, Kotarou c/o TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LIMITED Iwakuni Factory 2-1 Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | 02 /
CHIBA, Tomoyoshi 21-11-802 Yoshimien Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5132 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10848415.5 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP55359 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011118022 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2551386 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/60, D01D5/06, D01D5/12, D01D10/02 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
D01F6/605 (EP,US);
D01D10/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/06 (EP,US);
D01D5/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | D01F6/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | VOLLAROMATISCHE POLYAMIDFASER IN EINER METAFORM | [2013/05] | English: | META-FORM WHOLLY AROMATIC POLYAMIDE FIBER | [2013/05] | French: | FIBRE DE POLYAMIDE TOTALEMENT AROMATIQUE DE FORME MÉTA | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2012 | Translation filed | 18.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004003049 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0061] - [0072]; example 2; table 1 * [I] 3; | [XI]US4342715 (SHIMADA KEIZO, et al) [X] 1 * examples 7-9 * [I] 2,3 | International search | [Y]JP2004003049 (TEIJIN LTD); | [Y]WO2007089008 (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007254915 (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD) | by applicant | JP3514399B | JPS4710863B | JPS4817551B | JPS5052167 | JPS5631009 | JPH0874121 | JPH1088421 | JP2001348726 | JP2007254915 | JP2007262589 | WO2007089008 |