EP2544376 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Liangchuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Alexander, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Schmitz, Alexander, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10848676.2 | 29.03.2010 | WO2010CN71389 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120215 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544376 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/12, H04L1/00, H04L25/03 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04B10/6971 (EP,US);
H04L1/0047 (EP,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,US);
H04L25/03019 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03649 (EP,US);
H04L25/03006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | H04B1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND EMPFÄNGER ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG | [2013/02] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVER | [2013/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, SYSTÈME ET RÉCEPTEUR | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2012 | Translation filed | 04.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 03.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SHARMA R ET AL, "FORWARD-ERROR-CONTROL (FEC)-ASSISTED ADAPTIVE EQUALIZATION FOR DIGITAL CELLULAR MOBILE RADIO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19930201), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1109/25.192392, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 94 - 102, XP000363404 [I] 1-10 * section III * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.192392 | [A] - QURESHI S U H, "ADAPTIVE EQUALIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19850901), vol. 73, no. 9, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1349 - 1387, XP000608510 [A] 1-10 * page 33 * | International search | [A]US2005008070 (WANG JOHN S [US], et al); | [X]US2005169406 (BUCHALI FRED [DE]); | [A]CN1681227 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN1956362 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [A]CN101275827 (MITAC PREC TECHNOLOGY KUNSHAN [CN]); | [A]CN101383800 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |