EP2559397 - ULTRASONIC DENTAL TIP FOR REMOVING A POST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B&L Biotech Co., Ltd. No. 412 Cheongsong Plaza 1136-1 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do 435-040 / KR | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, In Hwan c/o B&L Biotech Co. Ltd. No. 412 Cheongsong Plaza 1136-1 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-040 / KR | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10849910.4 | 15.11.2010 | WO2010KR08027 | Priority number, date | KR20100035073 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100035073 | [2013/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011129506 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559397 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02, A61C19/06 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61C5/46 (EP,US);
A61C1/07 (US);
A61C17/20 (EP,US);
A61C3/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-DENTALSPITZE ZUR ENTFERNUNG EINES STIFTES | [2013/08] | English: | ULTRASONIC DENTAL TIP FOR REMOVING A POST | [2013/08] | French: | EMBOUT DENTAIRE À ULTRASONS POUR LE RETRAIT D'UN TENON | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2012 | Translation filed | 12.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP3005910U (YAMAZOE DENTAL CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH09201373 (WEISSMAN BERNARD); | [A]US5899693 (HIMENO KAZUKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2009142729 (NEUMEYER STEFAN [DE]) |