EP2581834 - MULTI-CORE PROCESSOR SYSTEM, CACHE COHERENCY CONTROL METHOD, AND CACHE COHERENCY CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takahisa c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Koichiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Hiromasa c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
KURIHARA, Koji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Lewin, David Nicholas Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Lewin, David Nicholas Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10853202.9 | 14.06.2010 | WO2010JP60056 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158320 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581834 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G06F12/0837 (EP,US);
G06F12/0828 (US);
G06F12/0815 (US);
G06F12/0842 (EP,US);
G06F12/0875 (US);
G06F12/0831 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1024 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1028 (EP,US);
G06F2212/171 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | MULTIKERNPROZESSORSYSTEM, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ZWISCHENSPEICHERKOHÄRENZ UND STEUERPROGRAMM FÜR ZWISCHENSPEICHERKOHÄRENZ | [2013/16] | English: | MULTI-CORE PROCESSOR SYSTEM, CACHE COHERENCY CONTROL METHOD, AND CACHE COHERENCY CONTROL PROGRAM | [2013/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROCESSEUR MULTICOEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE COHÉRENCE DE CACHE, ET PROGRAMME DE CONTRÔLE DE COHÉRENCE DE CACHE | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2012 | Translation filed | 07.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 08.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008263339 (KRIEGEL JON K [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0099] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2008263280 (GARA ALAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 11] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A] - JOHN H. KELM ET AL, "Cohesion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 37TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, ISCA '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1815961.1816019, ISBN 978-1-45-030053-7, page 429, XP055152826 [A] 1-6 * page 429, column right, line 2 - page 430, column left, line 25 * * page 430, column right, line 5 - line 6 * * page 431, column left, line 59 - column right, line 14 * * page 432, column left, line 11 - line 17 * * page 433, column left, line 2 - line 10 * * page 433, column right, line 3 - line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1815961.1816019 | International search | [A]JP3139392B (NEC CORP.); | [A]JP2002007371 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP3661614B (NEC CORP.); | [A]JP2007011580 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2008152571 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP4180569B (FUJITSU LTD.) | by applicant | JPH1097465 | JP2000207248 | JP2004133753 |