EP2588950 - USER MANAGEMENT FRAMEWORK FOR MULTIPLE ENVIRONMENTS ON A COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRES, Jose Paulo Av. Lavras, 654/901 90460-040 Porto Alegre, RS / BR | 02 /
ALI, Valiuddin 11445 Compaq Center Drive W Houston Texas 77070 / US | 03 /
BALACHEFF, Boris Filton Road Stoke Gifford Great Britian Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | 04 /
MANN, Jim 11445 Compaq Center Drive W Houston Texas 77070 / US | 05 /
MOSCHETTA, Eduardo Av. Alegrete, 510/203 90460-100 Porto Alegre, RS / BR | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/19] | 01 /
PIRES, Jose Paulo Av. Ipiranga 6.681 Predio 95-5 6 e 7 andares Porto Alegre Brazil 90619-900 Rio Grande Do Sul / BR | ||
02 /
ALI, Valiuddin 11445 Compaq Center Drive W Houston Texas 77070 / US | |||
03 /
BALACHEFF, Boris Filton Road Stoke Gifford Great Britian Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | |||
04 /
MANN, Jim 11445 Compaq Center Drive W Houston Texas 77070 / US | |||
05 /
MOSCHETTA, Eduardo Av. Ipiranga 6.681 Predio 95 -5 6 e 7 andares Porto Alegre Brazil 90619-900 Rio Grande Do Sul / BR | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10854231.7 | 01.07.2010 | WO2010US40779 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012002971 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588950 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/41, G06F9/44, G06F9/455, G06F21/45 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
G06F21/41 (EP,US);
H04L63/0884 (US);
G06F21/30 (US);
G06F21/45 (EP,US);
G06F9/45533 (US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (US);
H04L63/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | G06F9/44, G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | BENUTZERVERWALTUNGSARCHITEKTUR FÜR MEHRERE UMGEBUNGEN AUF EINER DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/19] | English: | USER MANAGEMENT FRAMEWORK FOR MULTIPLE ENVIRONMENTS ON A COMPUTING DEVICE | [2013/19] | French: | CADRE DE GESTION D'UTILISATEURS POUR ENVIRONNEMENTS MULTIPLES SUR DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 14.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2020 | 23.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/25] | 15.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007089111 (ROBINSON SCOTT H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0134] *; | [A]US2008235779 (BOGNER ETAY [IL]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0073] * | International search | [A]US2006179326 (LEUNG KWOK-YAN [CA]); | [X]US2008301770 (KINDER NATHAN G [US]); | [A]US2010037296 (SILVERSTONE ARIEL [US]); | [X]US2010146251 (LO YUAN-CHANG [US], et al); | [X]US2010153697 (FORD JEREMY [US], et al) |