EP2592319 - VALVE FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [2020/50] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Man-Seuk 105-502 Daedong Apt. Sangnam-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-777 / KR | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2020/50] |
Former [2013/20] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10854464.4 | 06.07.2010 | [2020/50] | WO2010KR04377 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005390 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592319 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2592319 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/12, F16K17/04, F15B13/02, F16K17/06, F16K17/10 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
F15B13/024 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/12 (KR);
F16K17/10 (US);
F15B13/02 (KR);
F16K17/02 (KR);
F16K17/04 (KR);
F16K17/065 (EP,KR,US);
F16K17/105 (EP,US);
F16K31/122 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | F16K31/12, F16K17/04, F15B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL ZUR DRUCKREGULIERUNG | [2013/20] | English: | VALVE FOR CONTROLLING PRESSURE | [2013/20] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE PRESSION | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | Translation filed | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2010 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | ES | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | MT | 09.12.2020 | NL | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | TR | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | GB | 06.07.2021 | IE | 06.07.2021 | LU | 06.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
TR | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
IE | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
LU | 06.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
GB | 06.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0791557 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19744337 (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]KR20080097029 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP HOLDING SE [SE]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2093467 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP HOLDING SE [SE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]KR100950571B (DONG WOO PREC CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] , [0048] , [0063] , [0065] , [0066]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]US2005178443 (CHEONG HAE K [KR]); | [A]US6986362 (CHEONG HAE KYUN [KR]); | [A]US2007056632 (CHEONG HAE K [KR]) |