EP2605584 - METHOD, MOBILE STATION AND MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK RESPONSE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yuantao 15/F Tower A Ocean International Center No.56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 02 /
LAN, Yuanrong 15/F Tower A Ocean International Center No.56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Yi 15/F Tower A Ocean International Center No.56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Hua 15/F Tower A Ocean International Center No.56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | 05 /
WU, Jianming 15/F Tower A Ocean International Center No.56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Ward, James Norman, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Ward, James Norman, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10855788.5 | 13.08.2010 | WO2010CN75992 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019367 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605584 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/26 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04W28/26 (KR);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, MOBILSTATION UND MEHRTRÄGERKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON UPLINK-REAKTIONSSIGNALEN | [2013/25] | English: | METHOD, MOBILE STATION AND MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK RESPONSE SIGNAL | [2013/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, STATION MOBILE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION À PORTEUSES MULTIPLES POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'UN SIGNAL DE RÉPONSE SUR LA LIAISON MONTANTE | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2013 | Translation filed | 06.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 24.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN101636995 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]CN101772181 (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECH RES, et al); | [A]CN101795492 (ZTE CORP) |