EP2615311 - FLOW RATE CONTROL DEVICE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT TYPE HYDRAULIC PUMP FOR CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Hee 1005-503, 125, Zulha 2-ro Jangyumyeon Gimhae-shi Gyeongsangnam-do 621-320 / KR | 02 /
JOUNG, Hea-Gyoon 104-702, SinJurye LG Apt. Jurye 2-dong Sasang-gu Busan 617-762 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Hung-Ju 416 Dormitory of Volvo Sinchon-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-370 / KR | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/29] | 01 /
LEE, Sang-Hee 321 Dormitory of Volvo Sinchon-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-370 / KR | ||
02 /
JOUNG, Hea-Gyoon 101-2203 SinJurye LG Apt. Jurye 2-dong Sasang-gu Busan 617-762 / KR | |||
03 /
SHIN, Hung-Ju 416 Dormitory of Volvo Sinchon-dong Seongsan-gu Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 642-370 / KR | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10857020.1 | 09.09.2010 | WO2010KR05742 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012033233 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615311 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/043, F15B13/02, E02F9/22, F15B21/08 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
E02F9/2235 (EP,KR,US);
F15B13/0433 (KR);
E02F9/2282 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2285 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,KR,US);
F15B13/021 (KR);
F15B9/04 (KR);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,KR,US);
F15B2211/255 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSRATENREGLER FÜR EINE HYDRAULISCHE VERSTELLPUMPE FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | [2013/29] | English: | FLOW RATE CONTROL DEVICE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT TYPE HYDRAULIC PUMP FOR CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT | [2013/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DU DÉBIT POUR UNE POMPE HYDRAULIQUE DU TYPE À CYLINDRÉE VARIABLE POUR ENGIN DE CHANTIER | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | Translation filed | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06159319 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [X]JP2000027803 (UCHIDA HYDRAULICS CO LTD); | [A]KR100637675B (HANIL HYDRAULICS CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2007205464 (BOSCH REXROTH CORP); | [A]KR20090059188 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP HOLDING SE [SE]) | by applicant | KR20010033699 |