EP2603665 - VERY HIGH PRESSURE SAMPLE CAPTURE AND TRANSPORTATION VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Blvd. Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLETIER, Michael T. 7826 Heather Heights Way Houston Texas 77095 / US | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Jennings, Michael John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10858756.9 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010US53528 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012054038 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603665 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/08 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
E21B49/0813 (EP,US);
F24S30/425 (EP,US);
F24S10/748 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | GEFÄSS FÜR PROBENNAHME UND -TRANSPORT BEI SEHR HOHEM DRUCK | [2013/25] | English: | VERY HIGH PRESSURE SAMPLE CAPTURE AND TRANSPORTATION VESSEL | [2013/25] | French: | CAPTURE D'ECHANTILLON SOUS TRES HAUTE PRESSION ET CUVE DE TRANSPORT | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 29.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2002060067 (BOLZE VICTOR M [US], et al); | [A]US2002185313 (JONES STANLEY C [US], et al); | [A]US2004099443 (MEISTER MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US7124819 (CIGLENEC REINHART [US], et al) | by applicant | US2002060067 |