EP2649742 - AUDIO FINGERPRINT DIFFERENCES FOR END-TO-END QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Empire Technology Development LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUGLICK, Ezekiel 13842 Deergrass Ct. Poway CA 92064-2276 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [2013/42] | Application number, filing date | 10860533.8 | 07.12.2010 | WO2010US59300 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012078142 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2649742 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/60, H04M3/22 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
G10L25/60 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (KR);
G10L21/00 (US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L19/018 (US);
H04L65/1083 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M3/2236 (EP,US);
H04M7/0072 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | H04L1/20, G10L19/00, H04W28/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | AUDIOFINGERABDRUCKDIFFERENZEN ZUR MESSUNG DER END-TO-END-ERFAHRUNGSQUALITÄT | [2013/42] | English: | AUDIO FINGERPRINT DIFFERENCES FOR END-TO-END QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT | [2013/42] | French: | DIFFÉRENCES D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES AUDIO POUR LA MESURE DE LA QUALITÉ D'EXPÉRIENCE DE BOUT EN BOUT | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 17.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 13.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/12] | 04.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004078575 (MORTEN GLENN A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,12 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraphs [0041] , [0044] , [0059] , [0086]; figure 4 *; | [XI]US2005143974 (JOLY ALEXANDRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0183]; figure 10 * * paragraphs [0188] , [0190] * [I] 3,4,7-9,13; | [XI]WO2010022303 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,12,14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 3a,3b * [I] 2,3,7,8,11,13,15 | International search | [A]US2005065976 (HOLM FRODE [US], et al); | [A]US2006020958 (ALLAMANCHE ERIC [DE], et al); | [A]US2009157391 (BILOBROV SERGIY [CA]) | by applicant | US2004078575 | US2005143974 | WO2010022303 |